SC S0408 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That Receipts From The Operation Of A Cable System And A Video Service Are Attributable To This State In Pro Rata Proportion Of The Costs Of Performing The Service

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Gross receipts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 49
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 69
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-27SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-02-26SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-02-26SenateRead second time
2019-02-26SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-02-20SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1262295(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback