SC S0440 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide For An Extension Of The Placed In Service Date For A Rehabilitated Abandoned Building Under Certain Circumstances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Textiles Communities Revitalization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 50
2019-05-31 Effective date See Act for Effective Date
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 70
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseAmended
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-19SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-14SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-03-14SenateRead second time
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-12SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3682 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
126520(n/a)See Bill Text
1267170(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback