SC S0449 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Fanning, Goldfinch, Rice, Senn
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Fanning, Goldfinch, Rice, Senn
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Make Technical Changes, To Provide That This Provision Regulates Both Persons Who Possess And Do Not Possess A Concealable Weapons Permit; To Delete Sections 23-31-225 And 23-31-230 Relating To The Unlawful Carrying Of A Concealed Weapon Into A Residence And The Carrying Of A Weapon Between An Automobile And An Accommodation; To Amend Section 23-31-235 Relating To The Posting Of Signs Prohibiting "concealed Weapons" And Replace With Conforming Language Of "weapons"; And By Amending Section 10-11-320 Related To The Trespasses And Offenses Of Public Buildings On Capitol Grounds, To Delete The Term "concealable Weapons' Permit" And Replace With The Term "firearm";
Title
SC Constitutional Carry Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Shane Martin [R] | Sen. Thomas Corbin [R] | Sen. Rex Rice [R] | Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] |
Sen. Danny Verdin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Fanning, Goldfinch, Rice, Senn |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer
H3930 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3930 (Similar To) 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 11 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 465 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0449&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/449_20170221.htm |