SC S0534 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 23-11-110, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Qualifications That A Sheriff Must Possess, So As To Provide That These Qualifications Also Apply To Candidates Who Wish To Serve As Sheriffs, To Make A Technical Change, And To Provide Additional Qualifications.
Title
Sheriff qualifications
Sponsors
Sen. Bradley Hutto [D] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Sen. Rex Rice [R] | Sen. Sean Bennett [R] | Sen. Sandra Senn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3951 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Act No. 70