SC S0540 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The State Department Of Employment And Workforce Review Committee May Nominate Less Than Three Qualified Candidates For The Position Of Executive Director Of The Department Of Employment And Workforce For The Governor's Consideration Until The Current Vacancy In The Position Of Executive Director Is Filled Or July 1, 2019, Whichever Occurs First. - Ratified Title
Title
DEW Director appointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 103 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date 04/03/19 | |
2019-04-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-04-03 | Ratified R 26 | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-03-28 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-03-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-2 |
2019-03-27 | House | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | House | Amended |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |