SC S0575 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-11-544, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Wild Turkey Hunting And Transportation Tags, So As To Delete The Term "wild Turkey Transportation Tags" And Replace It With The Term "wild Turkey Tag", To Provide The Tag Will No Longer Be Issued At No Cost, And To Revise The Number Of Tags Residents And Nonresidents May Obtain Or Possess; To Amend Section 50-11-580, Relating To The Season For The Hunting And Taking Of Male Wild Turkey, The Establishment Of Youth Turkey Hunting Weekend, Bag Limits, And An Annual Report, So As To Revise The Season For Hunting And Taking A Male Wild Turkey, To Revise The Bag Limits, To Delete The Provision Establishing Youth Turkey Hunting Weekend, To Provide For The Taking Of Female Wild Turkeys, And To Delete An Obsolete Provision; By Adding Section 50-11-590 So As To Provide For Youth Turkey Hunting Weekend; To Amend Section 50-9-920, As Amended, Relating To Revenues From The Sale Of Privileges, Licenses, Permits, And Tags, So As To Provide That Revenue Generated From Resident And Nonresident Wild Turkey Tags Shall Be Used For Certain Purposes; By Adding Section 50-9-640 So As To Provide Fees For Wild Turkey Tags; By Adding Section 50-11-546 So As To Provide For An Electronic Harvest Reporting System, And Requirements For Reporting The Harvest Of A Wild Turkey; To Amend Section 50-9-1120, Relating To The Point System Established For Violations Of Certain Provisions Of Law, So As To Provide Failing To Report The Harvest Of Wild Turkey Is A Six Point Violation; To Repeal Section 50-11-520 Relating To Wild Turkey Season And The Declaration Of Open Or Closed Seasons; And To Repeal Section 7 Of Act 41 Of 2015 Relating To The Hunting And Taking Of Wild Turkey. - Ratified Title
Title
Hunting and taking of wild turkey
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 51 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 71 | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2019-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-8-19 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2019-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4318 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 11 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 544 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 546 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 580 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 11 | 590 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 9 | 1120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 9 | 640 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 9 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |