SC S0595 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibit Individuals On The Sex Offender Registry From Working, With Or Without Compensation, With Minors, With Exceptions; And For Other Purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Childcare facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 52
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 72
2019-05-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-09SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-1
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseAmended
2019-05-08HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2019-05-08HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-05-07HouseDebate interrupted
2019-05-07HouseAmended
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-09SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-04-09SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-04-09SenateAmended
2019-04-03SenateRead second time
2019-03-29 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
2019-03-05SenateReferred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63131010(n/a)See Bill Text
631340(n/a)See Bill Text
6313420(n/a)See Bill Text
6313430(n/a)See Bill Text
631350(n/a)See Bill Text
6313620(n/a)See Bill Text
6313630(n/a)See Bill Text
6313810(n/a)See Bill Text
6313820(n/a)See Bill Text
6313830(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0595&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190329.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190409.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190501.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/595_20190513.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16310
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16770
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16790

Bill Comments

feedback