SC S0601 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-7-2350, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Criminal Background Restrictions On Foster Care Or Adoption Placements, So As Also To Apply To Employees Of Residential Facilities In Which Foster Children Are Placed And To Add Background Check Requirements For Such Employees. - Ratified Title
Title
Foster care or adoption placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Act No. 140 | |
2020-05-28 | Effective date 05/26/20 | |
2020-05-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-05-21 | Ratified R 145 | |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2020-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2020-05-12 | House | Conference report adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Shealy, Hutto and Young |
2020-03-11 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Bernstein, Collins, Caskey |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-41 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2020-02-12 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Amended |
2020-02-11 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep(s). Anderson, VS Moss, Garvin |
2020-02-05 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2020-02-04 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |