SC S0607 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Add Sixteen Precincts, To Eliminate Two Precincts, And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Berkeley County voting precincts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 40
2019-05-23 Effective date 05/13/19
2019-05-13 Signed By Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 54
2019-05-03HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-02HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-05-02HouseRoll call Yeas-76 Nays-0
2019-05-02HouseRead second time
2019-04-30HouseRecalled from Berkeley Delegation
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Berkeley Delegation
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-09SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-04-09SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-04-09SenateAmended
2019-04-03SenateRead second time
2019-04-02SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-05SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback