SC S0613 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-17-20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To The School Of Science And Mathematics' Endowment Fund, To Provide That The Endowment Fund Is Subject To The Direction Of The School's Board, To Require That The Endowment Fund Be Organized As A Nonprofit Entity, To Provide That The Endowment Fund Must Adopt An Annual Budget That Is Under The Oversight Of The School, To Provide That The School's Board And The Endowment Fund Must Enter Into An Operating Agreement, And To Provide That The Endowment Fund May Not Take Any Action Unless Authorized Pursuant To The Operating Agreement Approved By The School's Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School of Science and Mathematics' Endowment Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-17-20
2020-01-23HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2020-01-16HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2020-01-15HouseDebate adjourned until Thursday, January 16
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2019-05-02SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-04-23SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2019-04-23SenateRead second time
2019-04-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-18SenateCommittee report: Favorable Education
2019-04-18SenatePolled out of committee Education
2019-03-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
594870(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback