SC S0675 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 745 Of 1967, As Amended, Relating To Renewable Water Resources (rewa), Formerly Known As The Western Carolina Regional Sewer Authority, To Add The "southern Greenville" Area Of Greenville County To Rewa's Service Territory, To Express The General Assembly's Intent To Designate A Map As The Document Of Record On Which Rewa's Amended Boundary Lines Are Delineated, To Provide That No Residential Or Commercial Entity Located Within The Southern Greenville Extended Territory Is Required To Tap Into The Services Provided By Rewa Unless The Entity Does So Voluntarily Or Has No Other Dhec-approved Method For Disposal, And To Revise The Conditions Under Which A Residential Or Commercial Entity Located In The Northern Greenville Area Of Rewa May Tap Into The Services Provided By Rewa. - Ratified Title
Title
Renewable Water Resources (REWA)
Sponsors
Sen. Ross Turner [R] | Sen. Karl Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 110 | |
2019-05-17 | Effective date 05/13/19 | |
2019-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Ratified R 55 | |
2019-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-1 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-01 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Greenville Delegation |
2019-04-24 | House | Committed to Greenville Delegation |
2019-04-24 | House | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
Same As/Similar To
H4265 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Referred to Greenville Delegation