SC S0735 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Abolish The Clarendon County Board Of Education; To Amend Act 593 Of 1986, As Amended, Relating To The Board Of Trustees Of School District No. 1 And School District No. 2 In Clarendon County, So As To Provide That The Clarendon County Legislative Delegation Makes Four Appointments To The Board Of Trustees Of School District No. 1 In Clarendon County And Nine Appointments To The Board Of Trustees Of School District No. 2 In Clarendon County; And To Repeal Certain Local Provisions Inconsistent With This Act. - Ratified Title
Title
Clarendon County Board of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 109 | |
2019-05-16 | Effective date 05/07/19 | |
2019-05-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-61 Nays-26 |
2019-05-07 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-61 Nays-26 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Veto overridden by originating body Ayes-34 Nays-0 |
2019-05-01 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2019-04-25 | Ratified R 35 | |
2019-04-23 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-04-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-76 Nays-0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-11 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Clarendon Delegation |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Clarendon Delegation |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |