SC S0753 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 38-7-20, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Insurance Premium Taxes, So As To Transfer One Percent Of The Revenues To The V-safe Program; And To Transfer Certain Funds To The V-safe Program. - Ratified Title
Title
Insurance premium tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Act No. 149 | |
2020-10-02 | Effective date 09/28/20 | |
2020-09-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 158 | |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2020-09-23 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-09-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2020-09-22 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-22 | House | Amended |
2020-09-16 | House | Debate adjourned until Thurs., 09-17-20 |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |