SC S0879 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3530, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Community Development Tax Credits, So As To Delete An Aggregate Credit Provision And Set An Annual Limit.
Title
Community development tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0424 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H4133 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Act No. 77
H4133 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Act No. 77
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0879&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/879_20191211.htm |