SC S0888 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The Governing Bodies Of Public School Districts And Charter Schools May Allow Certain Faculty And Staff To Be Compensated For Unused Annual Leave And Sick Leave In Excess Of Ninety Days At The End Of Each Fiscal Year, To Make This Provision Applicable To Leave In Excess Of Ninety Days Accrued After July 1, 2018, And To Clarify The Impact On Existing Teacher Incentive Programs And Local Authority Relating To Such Programs
Title
Public school faculty members, unused leave
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 198 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date 05/15/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 216 | |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2018-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-2-18 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |