SC S0913 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For A Youth Hunting Day For Hunting Antlered Deer Only And To Provide A Bag Limit, To Provide That Youth Hunters Who Have Not Completed The Hunter Education Program Must Be Accompanied By An Adult, And To Provide The License Or Tag Requirement Is Waived For A Youth Hunter On A Youth Hunting Day
Title
Youth Hunting Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 200 | |
2018-05-24 | Effective date 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 218 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference report adopted |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Campsen, Goldfinch, Bright Matthews |
2018-05-09 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Hixon, Kirby, Yow |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2018-05-09 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-08 | House | Amended |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4828 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry