SC S1021 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 299
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 299
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND ACT 476 OF 1969, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE VALLEY PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY IN AIKEN COUNTY, SO AS TO ADD TWO MEMBERS TO THE GOVERNING BOARD OF THE AUTHORITY AND TO PROVIDE FOR THEIR TERMS AND MANNER OF APPOINTMENT. - ratified title
Title
Add Two Members To The Governing Board Of The Authority And To Provide For Their Terms And Manner Of Appointment. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 299 | |
2010-06-11 | Effective date 06/07/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Ratified R 257 | |
2010-05-27 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-34 | |
2010-05-26 | Read second time HJ-6 | |
2010-05-25 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-9 | |
2010-05-21 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-1 | |
2010-05-20 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day SJ-14 | |
2010-05-20 | Read second time SJ-14 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-58 |
Same As/Similar To
H4175 (Similar To) 2010-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Aiken Delegation HJ-19
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1021&session=118 |