SC S1099 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 345
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 345
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO ADOPT REVISED CODE VOLUME 22 OF THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, TO THE EXTENT OF ITS CONTENTS, AS THE ONLY GENERAL PERMANENT STATUTORY LAW OF THE STATE AS OF JANUARY 1, 2010. - ratified title
Title
Adopt Revised Code Volume 22 Of The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To The Extent Of Its Contents, As The Only General Permanent Statutory Law Of The State As Of January 1, 2010. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 345 | |
2010-04-12 | Effective date 03/31/10 | |
2010-03-31 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-03-25 | Ratified R 149 | |
2010-03-05 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-7 | |
2010-03-04 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-13 | |
2010-03-04 | Read second time HJ-13 | |
2010-03-03 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-22 | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-49 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced and read first time HJ-49 | |
2010-01-28 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-8 | |
2010-01-27 | Read second time SJ-24 | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference SJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H4415 (Similar To) 2010-02-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-8
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1099&session=118 |