SC S1142 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 327
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 327
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO APPROVE REGULATIONS OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE, RELATING TO UNIFORM REAL PROPERTY RECORDING ACT, DESIGNATED AS REGULATION DOCUMENT NUMBER 4078, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 1, CHAPTER 23, TITLE 1 OF THE 1976 CODE. - ratified title
Title
Approve Regulations Of The Secretary Of State, Relating To Uniform Real Property Recording Act, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4078, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 327 | |
2010-04-12 | Effective date 03/31/10 | |
2010-03-31 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-03-25 | Ratified R 153 | |
2010-03-04 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-12 | |
2010-03-03 | Read second time HJ-12 | |
2010-02-24 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary HJ-5 | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-11 | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced and read first time HJ-11 | |
2010-02-10 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-9 | |
2010-02-09 | Read second time SJ-19 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference SJ-3 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1142&session=118 |