SC S1160 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective date See Act
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective date See Act
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Members Of The Board Of Trustees May Establish Compensation For Board Members In An Amount Up To Eight Hundred Dollars Per Month, And Nine Hundred Dollars Per Month For The Charleston County School Board Chairman, And To Provide That Any Compensation Amount Established By The Board Of Trustees Must Not Take Effect Until After The Next Regularly Scheduled Election For Board Members
Title
Charleston County School District
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Marlon Kimpson [D] | Sen. Stephen Goldfinch [R] | Sen. Paul Campbell [R] |
Sen. Sean Bennett [R] | Sen. Lawrence Grooms [R] | Sen. Margie Matthews [D] | Sen. Sandra Senn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 49) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 49) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Effective date See Act | |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Veto overridden Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2018-06-28 | House | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-70 Nays-15 |
2018-05-19 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 230 | |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-50 Nays-21 |
2018-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-2-18 |
2018-04-26 | House | Recalled from Charleston Delegation |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Charleston Delegation |
2018-04-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |