SC S348 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Act No. 292
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Act No. 292
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 63-13-825 SO AS TO REQUIRE FAMILY CHILDCARE OPERATORS AND CAREGIVERS ANNUALLY TO COMPLETE A MINIMUM OF TWO HOURS OF TRAINING APPROVED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES AND TO REQUIRE THE DEPARTMENT TO POST ON ITS WEBSITE HOMES THAT ARE IN COMPLIANCE WITH THIS TRAINING REQUIREMENT AND THOSE THAT ARE NOT; AND TO AMEND SECTION 16-3-740, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO TESTING CRIMINAL OFFENDERS FOR SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES WHEN A CRIME VICTIM HAS BEEN EXPOSED TO BODILY FLUIDS DURING THE COMMISSION OF THE CRIME, SO AS TO ESTABLISH A FORTY-EIGHT HOUR TIME FRAME WITHIN WHICH THE SOLICITOR MUST PETITION THE COURT TO HAVE THE OFFENDER TESTED WHEN THE VICTIM HAS MADE SUCH REQUEST. - ratified title
Title
Establish A Forty-eight Hour Time Frame Within Which The Solicitor Must Petition The Court To Have The Offender Tested When The Victim Has Made Such Request. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Fair [R] | Sen. John Knotts [R] | Sen. Joel Lourie [D] | Sen. Shane Martin [R] |
Sen. Michael Rose [R] | Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] | Sen. Phillip Shoopman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | Act No. 292 | |
2010-09-01 | Effective date 08/27/10 | |
2010-08-27 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-08-23 | Ratified R 353 | |
2010-06-29 | Ordered enrolled for ratification HJ-2 | |
2010-06-16 | Conference report received and adopted SJ-217 | |
2010-06-16 | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-1 HJ-357 | |
2010-06-16 | Conference report received and adopted HJ-357 | |
2010-06-15 | Conference committee appointed Kelly, Rutherford, and Sottile HJ-96 | |
2010-06-15 | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hutto, Rose, and Shoopman SJ-68 | |
2010-06-03 | Roll call Yeas-1 Nays-94 HJ-56 | |
2010-06-03 | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment HJ-56 | |
2010-06-02 | Debate adjourned until Thursday, June 3, 2010 HJ-67 | |
2010-05-27 | Returned to House with amendments SJ-71 | |
2010-05-27 | House amendment amended SJ-71 | |
2010-05-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-13 | |
2010-05-25 | Read second time HJ-45 | |
2010-05-25 | Amended HJ-45 | |
2010-05-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-20 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-3 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-23 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-23 | |
2010-03-25 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-35 | |
2010-03-24 | Read second time SJ-26 | |
2010-03-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-16 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-33 | |
2010-03-16 | Minority Report Removed SJ-33 | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rose, Shoopman | |
2009-01-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-6 | |
2009-01-29 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H3436 (Similar To) 2009-02-04 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-13
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0348&session=118 |