SD HB1010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recodify, to make certain form and style changes, to clarify, and to repeal certain provisions related to the South Dakota Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recodify, to make certain form and style changes, to clarify, and to repeal certain provisions related to the South Dakota Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-12SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 H.J. 366
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 336
2019-02-08SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 346
2019-02-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 303
2019-02-05SenateRetirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 275
2019-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-29SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 214
2019-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 223
2019-01-24HouseRetirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 18

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback