SD HB1014 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the purchase of land by the South Dakota Department of the Military for use by the South Dakota Army National Guard and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the purchase of land by the South Dakota Department of the Military for use by the South Dakota Army National Guard and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 762 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 710 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 716 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 671 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 651 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 625 |
2017-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 4. H.J. 595 |
2017-02-28 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 1. H.J. 564 |
2017-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-15 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 20 |