SD HB1014 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 H.J. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 H.J. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding payments of the tax imposed on financial institutions and banks.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding payments of the tax imposed on financial institutions and banks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 H.J. 304 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 H.J. 276 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 220 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 241 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 202 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 179 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 122 |
2019-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 131 |
2019-01-15 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-15 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 66 |
2019-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 19 |