SD HB1018 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer the collection of various fees from the Department of Revenue to the Department of Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Transfer the collection of various fees from the Department of Revenue to the Department of Environment and Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2019 H.J. 336 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 305 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 311 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 265 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 242 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 123 |
2019-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 131 |
2019-01-15 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-15 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 66 |
2019-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 20 |