SD HB1021 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding bid bonds for public improvement contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding bid bonds for public improvement contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-25SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 544
2019-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 478
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-21SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 446
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 190
2019-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172
2019-01-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-23HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 156
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 20

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback