SD HB1022 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 768
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase improved property in Spearfish and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase improved property in Spearfish and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 768 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 713 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 643 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 644 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 608 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 578 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 193 |
2015-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 168 |
2015-01-23 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 115 |
2015-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 38 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 26 |