SD HB1024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain species of game fish to be used as bait.
Title
Authorize certain species of game fish to be used as bait.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 386 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 358 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 363 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 341 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 281 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 243 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1024ba |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 157 |
2019-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 150 |
2019-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 141 |
2019-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 132 |
2019-01-15 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 66 |
2019-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 21 |