SD HB1028 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - No motion to place on calendar H.J. 518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding professional counselors and marriage and family therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding professional counselors and marriage and family therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House Health and Human Services Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseNo motion to place on calendar H.J. 518
2019-02-21HouseHealth and Human Services Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 476
2019-02-21HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 6.
2019-02-21HouseAmend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1028be
2019-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19HouseHealth and Human Services Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1028bd
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback