SD HB1029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require a permit to conduct mining operations for certain ore milling facilities.
Title
Require a permit to conduct mining operations for certain ore milling facilities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478 |
2021-02-25 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 398 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 344 |
2021-02-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 354 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 304 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 158 |
2021-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 167 |
2021-01-28 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-01-28 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 1 |