SD HB1032 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 H.J. 318
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 H.J. 318
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the minimum cost of living adjustment and revise terminology of the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Revise the minimum cost of living adjustment and revise terminology of the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Retirement Laws: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Retirement Laws: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 H.J. 318 |
2021-02-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 11, 2021 H.J. 283 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 242 |
2021-02-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 257 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 214 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 202 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 102 |
2021-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 110 |
2021-01-20 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 3 |
2021-01-20 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 2 |
2021-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 1 |