SD HB1035 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and provide certain procedures for filing, certifying, and challenging petitions.
Title
Revise and provide certain procedures for filing, certifying, and challenging petitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - State Affairs Do Pass, Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - State Affairs Do Pass, Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 756 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 739 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 722 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 713 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 731 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 708 Amendment Cc1035a |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 728 Amendment Cc1035a |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 686 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 711 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 663 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 632 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1035fa |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 204 |
2017-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 0. H.J. 182 |
2017-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 168 |
2017-01-20 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 92 |
2017-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 24 |
Subjects
Elections
Initiative and Referendum
Legislature and Statutes
Prison or Jail Cost Estimates
State Affairs and Government
Initiative and Referendum
Legislature and Statutes
Prison or Jail Cost Estimates
State Affairs and Government