SD HB1039 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Signed by Governor H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the use of an exemption certificate for tax purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the use of an exemption certificate for tax purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-18 Signed by Governor H.J. 458
2010-02-17 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 455
2010-02-16 Signed by President S.J. 342
2010-02-12 Signed by Speaker H.J. 387
2010-02-11 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 307
2010-02-10 Placed on consent, Passed
2010-02-10 Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 272
2010-02-10 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-27 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 153
2010-01-26 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 177
2010-01-25 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 170
2010-01-22 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 163
2010-01-21 Placed on consent, Passed
2010-01-21 Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 142
2010-01-21 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-12 First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 26

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback