SD HB1039 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempt certain impaired driving violations from the statutory limitation on enhanced penalties for second, third, or subsequent violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt certain impaired driving violations from the statutory limitation on enhanced penalties for second, third, or subsequent violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-02 Signed by Governor H.J. 720
2012-02-27 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 639
2012-02-24 Signed by President S.J. 563
2012-02-23 Signed by Speaker H.J. 588
2012-02-22 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 7. S.J. 510
2012-02-21 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 479
2012-02-21 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-26 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 195
2012-01-25 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 20. H.J. 204
2012-01-24 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 189
2012-01-20 Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed H.J. 77
2012-01-13 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 50
2012-01-13 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-10 First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback