SD HB1039 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 651
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify the gross receipts subject to taxation by the retail sales and service tax, the gross receipts tax on visitor related businesses, the municipal non-ad valorem tax, and the municipal gross receipts tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify the gross receipts subject to taxation by the retail sales and service tax, the gross receipts tax on visitor related businesses, the municipal non-ad valorem tax, and the municipal gross receipts tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-04SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 651
2013-02-26SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 559
2013-02-25SenateSigned by President S.J. 570
2013-02-22SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 509
2013-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 526
2013-02-20SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2013-02-20SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 482
2013-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 181
2013-01-18HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 121
2013-01-17HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 93
2013-01-17HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 28

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback