SD HB1039 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor H.J. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain reversion provisions relating to the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain reversion provisions relating to the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2013.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 790
2014-03-13SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 773
2014-03-13SenateSigned by President S.J. 653
2014-03-12SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 750
2014-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 717
2014-03-10SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 594
2014-03-05SenateAppropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 544
2014-03-05SenateAppropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1039na
2014-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-03-03SenateDeferred by Chair
2014-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 172
2014-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 5. H.J. 163
2014-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 130
2014-01-24HouseAppropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 95
2014-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-01-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback