SD HB1039 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions related to the regulation of grain buyers and grain warehouses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions related to the regulation of grain buyers and grain warehouses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 508
2015-02-18SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 443
2015-02-17SenateSigned by President S.J. 423
2015-02-12SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 402
2015-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 373
2015-02-10SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-02-10SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 353
2015-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-29SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 235
2015-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 208
2015-01-27HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-01-27HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 175
2015-01-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-01-14HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 39
2015-01-13HouseFirst read in House H.J. 29

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback