SD HB1039 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise various trust and trust company provisions and to establish and regulate South Dakota special spousal trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise various trust and trust company provisions and to establish and regulate South Dakota special spousal trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 18, 2016 H.J. 458
2016-02-16SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 16, 2016 H.J. 405
2016-02-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 295
2016-02-10SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 373
2016-02-09SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 264
2016-02-08SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2016-02-08SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 244
2016-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 141
2016-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 172
2016-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 29. H.J. 171 Amendment 1039oa
2016-01-22HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 146
2016-01-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-01-13HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 36
2016-01-12HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback