SD HB1039 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize certain rule making authority for the State Board of Finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize certain rule making authority for the State Board of Finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House Placed on consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-09SenateSigned by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
2017-02-08SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 08, 2017 H.J. 352
2017-02-07SenateSigned by the President S.J. 333
2017-02-06SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 314
2017-02-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 299
2017-02-02SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2017-02-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 267
2017-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 183
2017-01-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 164
2017-01-20HousePlaced on consent, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
2017-01-20HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 92
2017-01-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-01-13HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 52
2017-01-10HouseFirst read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 25

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback