SD HB1039 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the use of the Obligation Recovery Center by certain postsecondary technical institutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the use of the Obligation Recovery Center by certain postsecondary technical institutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-13SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 399
2019-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 3. S.J. 357
2019-02-11SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 336
2019-02-08SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 310
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 107
2019-01-15HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 69
2019-01-14HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 44
2019-01-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-09HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 30

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback