SD HB1044 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the state aid to general education formula.
Title
Revise the state aid to general education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 H.J. 881 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2016 H.J. 877 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 615 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 877 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 19. H.J. 869 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 605 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 604 Amendment cc1044a |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 865 Amendment cc1044a |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 596 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 853 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 573 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 573 Amendment 1044ga |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 555 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 531 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 504 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 504 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 4. H.J. 739 |
2016-02-29 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2. H.J. 711 |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 62 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 36 |
2016-01-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 23 |