SD HB1046 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding child custody during a soldier's deployment.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding child custody during a soldier's deployment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor H.J. 734 | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 717 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 647 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 678 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 584 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 500 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 483 | |
2012-02-15 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 434 | |
2012-02-15 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1046od | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-08 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-30 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 213 | |
2012-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 232 | |
2012-01-26 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 232 Amendment 1046ja | |
2012-01-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 185 | |
2012-01-20 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 72 | |
2012-01-20 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1046oa | |
2012-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 24 |