SD HB1050 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the use and possession of scanning devices and reencoders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the use and possession of scanning devices and reencoders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 18, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-07SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 H.J. 674
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 647
2019-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 598
2019-02-28SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 546
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 475
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 463
2019-02-20HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-20HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 447
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-15HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 67

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback