SD HB1052 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the notice given to county commissioners for special sessions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the notice given to county commissioners for special sessions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-12SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 H.J. 366
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 336
2019-02-08SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 346
2019-02-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 302
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-06SenateLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 276
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 201
2019-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 211
2019-01-24HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 167
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-15HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 68

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback