SD HB1053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the value of gifts permitted for certain insurance advertising or promotional programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the value of gifts permitted for certain insurance advertising or promotional programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 18, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-07SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 H.J. 674
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 647
2019-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 599
2019-02-28SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 191
2019-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172
2019-01-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-23HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 156
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-15HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 68

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback