SD HB1054 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the possession of firearms on certain vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the possession of firearms on certain vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-13SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 399
2019-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 0. S.J. 356
2019-02-11SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 326
2019-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 191
2019-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172
2019-01-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-23HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 155
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 129

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback