SD HB1056 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit certain local ordinances regarding firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit certain local ordinances regarding firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President S.J. 527
2019-02-22SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 485
2019-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 462
2019-02-20SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-11SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 331
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 344
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 344 Amendment 1056wc
2019-02-06HouseFiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 309
2019-01-31HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 277
2019-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1056ca
2019-01-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 141

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1056&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1056P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1056HLO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1056H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1056ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27726&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28037&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28475&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28612&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29057&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback