SD HB1058 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain record search fees charged by clerks of court.
Title
Revise certain record search fees charged by clerks of court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-19 | Deliver line item veto to the Governor H.J. 745 | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Line Item Veto Consideration, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 678 | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 678 | |
2012-03-19 | Intent to reconsider, Passed S.J. 678 | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Line Item Veto Consideration, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 677 | |
2012-03-19 | House of Representatives Line Item Veto Consideration, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 738 | |
2012-03-19 | Line Item Veto H.J. 735 | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 717 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 647 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 683 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 605 Amendment 1058btc | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 604 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 604 Amendment 1058bd | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 1058btb | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 569 | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. Amendment 1058aa | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Senate Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 435 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-13 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 177 | |
2012-01-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 19. H.J. 174 | |
2012-01-24 | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 18. H.J. 173 | |
2012-01-23 | Intent to reconsider H.J. 166 | |
2012-01-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 21. H.J. 165 | |
2012-01-20 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 62 | |
2012-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-13 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 46 |