SD HB1059 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to the garnishment of debts and property.
Title
Revise provisions related to the garnishment of debts and property.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 23, 2016 H.J. 650 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 398 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 427 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 308 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 290 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 167 |
2016-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 200 |
2016-01-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-01-25 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 159 |
2016-01-25 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1059ra |
2016-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 58 |