SD HB1059 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the perfection of liens upon application for duplicate certificates of title.
Title
Provide for the perfection of liens upon application for duplicate certificates of title.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. John Mills [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Sen. Jim White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2017 H.J. 682 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2017 H.J. 596 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 560 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 558 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 515 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 204 |
2017-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 178 |
2017-01-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-01-23 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 159 |
2017-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 85 |